Zarabi, Sarah Farshchi (CPSO#: 98217)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Nov 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Nov 2016

Summary

Former Name: Farshchi Zarabi, Sara (used until: 15 Jun 2017 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Shiraz University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Health System
1200 Fourth Ave
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH FARSHCHI ZARABI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZARABI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 16 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 17 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 16 Nov 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 17 Nov 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 16 Nov 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Jan 2019
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Nov 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2016