Zarinehbaf Asadi, Sanaz (CPSO#: 93013)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, Turkish

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Vaughan Pain clinic
3175 Rutherford Rd Suite #23
Concord ON  L4K 5Y6
Phone: (905) 761-1288
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

250 Harding Boulevard West Unit 312
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Canada
Phone: (905) 883-7997
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

3292 Bayview Ave.
North York ON  M2M 4J5
Canada
Phone: (416) 222-7546
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Zarinehbaf Asadi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 01 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Zarinehbaf Asadi ( CPSO# 93013 )

Business Address:
23 - 3175 Rutherford Road
Concord ON  L4K 5Y6

Business Address:
205 - 3292 Bayview Avenue
North York ON  M2M 4J5

Business Address:
312 - 250 Harding Boulevard West
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7

Business Address:
10 Royal Orchard Boulevard
Basement Level
Markham ON  L3T 7R9
Phone Number: (905) 771-7600

Business Address:
Unit 4
160 Main Street South
Brampton ON  L6W 2E1
Phone Number: (905) 450-2700

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANAZ ZARINEHBAF ASADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZARINEHBAF ASADI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012