Zawahir, Mohamed Maznawi (CPSO#: 91801)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 07 Jul 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil, Urdu

Education:Aga Khan University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Zawahir Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 8 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - District of Columbia
USA - Mississippi
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  February 26, 2016
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On April 14, 2016, Markham Stouffville Hospital notified the College that Dr. Mohamed Maznawi Zawahir's privileges were suspended, effective February 26, 2016.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 07 Jul 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Jul 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 06 Dec 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Nov 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Nov 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee Effective: 16 Feb 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee Effective: 19 Feb 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee Effective: 17 May 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee Effective: 17 May 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee Effective: 14 Feb 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee Effective: 14 Jul 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Quality Assurance Committee Effective: 14 Jul 2017 Active View Details [+]
            (1 of 2) 
            As from June 30, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Mohamed Maznawi
            Zawahir, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Zawahir to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of

                                    DR. MOHAMED ZAWAHIR
                                          ("Dr. Zawahir")
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
            ________________________________________________________________________

            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public. 
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Zawahir, certificate of registration number 91801, am a member of
                  the College. The College has received information that I have failed to
                  maintain the standard of practice of the profession.

            (3)   I, Dr. Zawahir, acknowledge that the College initiated an investigation
                  bearing File Number 7215048 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged
                  in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my anesthesia
                  practice.  

            (4)   I, Dr. Zawahir, acknowledge that I have not practiced medicine in Ontario
                  since February 19, 2016. 


            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Zawahir, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately ("Effective Date").

            (6)   I, Dr. Zawahir, undertake that I will continue to cease to practise
                  medicine in Ontario until each and every one of the following conditions
                  have been met:

                  (a)   I provide a minimum of forty-five (45) days' notice to the College
                        of my intent to return to the practice of medicine; 
                  
                  (b)   The ICR Committee approves my return to the practice of medicine;
                        and, 
                  
                  (c)   I provide the College with proof that I am participating in a
                        program of continuing professional development that meets the
                        requirements for continuing professional development of the Royal
                        College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada, the College of Family
                        Physicians of Canada, or an organization that has been approved by
                        the College for that purpose that meets the requirements for
                        continuing professional development set by the Royal College of
                        Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family
                        Physicians of Canada.
                  
            (7)   I, Dr. Zawahir, undertake that upon signing this Undertaking I shall
                  forward a request to the General Manager of OHIP that my billing number
                  be deactivated for services rendered after the date I cease to practise
                  and before the date the College agrees that I may return to practise in
                  accordance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (8)   I, Dr. Zawahir, undertake to abide by the College's Policy on Practice
                  Management Considerations for Physicians Who Cease to Practise, Take an
                  Extended Leave of Absence or Close Their Practice Due to Relocation, a
                  copy of which is attached hereto as Appendix "A".

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENTS

            (9)   I, Dr. Zawahir, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Zawahir, acknowledge that in considering my request to return to
                  practice, the ICR Committee may, among other things:

                  (a)   request that I agree to specified terms, limitations or conditions
                        being placed upon my certificate of registration, including that I
                        may not be the Most Responsible Physician; and
                  
                  (b)   request that I enter into an appropriate assessment and/or
                        monitoring agreement with the College.
                  
            (11)  I, Dr. Zawahir, acknowledge that I shall also require approval of the
                  Registration Committee before entering into any undertaking which imposes
                  term, conditions and limitation on my certificate of registration. 

            (12)  I, Dr. Zawahir, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (13)  I, Dr. Zawahir, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (14)  I, Dr. Zawahir, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (15)  I, Dr. Zawahir, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code.

            (16)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Zawahir, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Zawahir, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (16)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr.
                              Zawahir engaged in professional misconduct and/or is
                              incompetent in the practice of anesthesia. In the face of
                              these allegations, Dr. Zawahir has ceased to practise
                              medicine in Ontario and therefore cannot see any patients or
                              provide any medical advice or services.
                  
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (17)  I, Dr. Zawahir, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that
                  may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (18)  I, Dr. Zawahir, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "B" and that the consent forms part of this
                  Undertaking.



            (2 of 2) 
            The certificate of registration held by Dr. Mohamed Maznawi Zawahir also
            carries the following term, condition and limitation imposed by the
            Registration Committee, effective November 18, 2010.

                  Dr. Mohamed Maznawi Zawahir may practise medicine independently in
                  anaesthesia, only. 

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: June 30, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Mohamed Maznawi Zawahir to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 30, 2017:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Zawahir engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in the practice of anesthesia. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Zawahir has ceased to practise medicine in Ontario and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.