Zbar, Ariella (CPSO#: 96071)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Public Health Sudbury & Districts
1300 Paris Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 3A3
Phone: (705) 522-9200
Fax: (705) 677-9624
Electoral District: 08

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective: 25 May 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARIELLA ZBAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZBAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2013