Zec, Michelle Lynette (CPSO#: 96858)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Health Sciences Centre,
Kingston General Hospital Site,
76 Stuart Street
Rm 9-311
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: 613-549-6666 Ext. 4215
Fax: (613) 548-2477
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELLE LYNETTE ZEC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZEC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 03 Oct 2011 to 28 Oct 2011
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2014