Zed, Sarah Elizabeth (CPSO#: 94988)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 11 Feb 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Feb 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 07 Nov 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 04 May 2011 to 31 May 2011
Elective Trainee - Hematology

University of Toronto, 15 Jan 2014 to 11 Feb 2014
Elective Trainee - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Feb 2014