Zeilig, Lauren Vincent (CPSO#: 19593)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 1965

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 18 Sep 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 307
2221 Keele Street
Toronto ON  M6M 3Z5
Phone: (416) 785-8889
Fax: (416) 785-7844
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L.V. Zeilig Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 26 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Zeilig ( CPSO# 19593 )

Business Address:
307 - 2221 Keele Street
Toronto ON  M6M 3Z5
Phone Number: (416) 785-8889

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1962
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1965
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 18 Sep 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 03 May 2018
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 23 May 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 23 May 2018 Active

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: September 18, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Lauren Vincent Zeilig to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 18, 2017:

The College received information from the Narcotics Monitoring System about Dr. Zeilig’s prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics.

Based on the information received, the College conducted an investigation into whether Dr. Zeilig failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and/or was incompetent in his prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Zeilig’s prescribing of narcotic drugs, narcotic preparations, controlled drugs, benzodiazepines and other targeted substances, and other monitored drugs will be supervised by a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for a minimum of nine (9) months.

Dr. Zeilig will engage in professional education in the prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics.

Following the professional education and period of supervision, Dr. Zeilig’s prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics, will be re-assessed by an assessor selected by the College.