Zelenietz, Caleb Solomon Grant (CPSO#: 97519)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Mar 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Mar 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CALEB SOLOMON GRANT ZELENIETZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZELENIETZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 31 May 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2014 to 15 Dec 2014
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 May 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2017