Zeman, Peter Ronald (CPSO#: 76163)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oak Ridges Medical Centre
Unit 303
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone: (905) 751-2941
Fax: (905) 751-0107
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

BradfordCardiac & DiagnosticCentre
80 Holland Street East
Bradford ON  L3Z 2B7
Canada
Phone: (905) 551-2944
Fax: (877) 552-9250
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 895-4521
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Alliston Diagnostic Centre
117 Young Street, Unit 21
Alliston, ON
L9R 0E9
Alliston ON  L9R 0E9
Canada
Phone: 705-434-0074
Fax: 705-434-9074
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Stevenson Memorial Hospital
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Canada
Phone: (705) 435-6281 Ext. 2346
Fax: (705) 434-5219
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zeman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 07 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Zeman ( CPSO# 76163 )

Business Address:
80 Holland Street
Bradford ON  L3Z 2B8
Phone Number: (905) 551-2944

Business Address:
21 - 117 Young Street
Alliston ON  L9R 0E9
Phone Number: (705) 434-0074

Business Address:
Oak Ridge Medical Centre
Unit 303
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone Number: (905) 751-2941

Business Address:
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Phone Number: (705) 435-6281

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 21 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER RONALD ZEMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZEMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Oct 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Nov 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2005