Zeman-Pocrnich, Cady Erika (CPSO#: 90727)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Names: Zeman, Cady Erika (used until: 19 Jul 2016 )     Pocrnich, Cady Erika (used until: 07 Jul 2016 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Pathology
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: 519-685-8500 Ext. 32766
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CADY ERIKA ZEMAN-POCRNICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZEMAN-POCRNICH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2015