Zerhouni Abdouh, Siham (CPSO#: 97022)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Aug 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Aug 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
General Surgical Oncology Effective: 27 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 04 May 2015 to 29 May 2015
Elective Trainee - Surgical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - Surgical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 8 - Surgical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 May 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 May 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Aug 2018