Zettler, Michael Lawrence (CPSO#: 93373)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton Healthcare Services
Georgetown Hospital
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone: (905) 873-0111
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Qikiqtani General Hospital
Iqaluit NU  X0A 0H0
Canada
County: 
Electoral District: 

Haliburton Highlands FHT
Box 870
7217 Gelert Road
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0
Canada
County: County of Haliburton
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Zettler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 14 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Zettler ( CPSO# 93373 )

Business Address:
Halton Healthcare Services
Georgetown Hospital
1 Princess Anne Drive
Halton Hills ON  L7G 2B8
Phone Number: (905) 873-0111

Business Address:
Haliburton Highlands FHT
Box 870
7217 Gelert Road
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0
Phone Number: (705) 457-1212

Business Address:
Qikiqtani General Hospital
Iqaluit NU  X0A 0H0
Phone Number: (867) 975-8600

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Haliburton Highlands Health Services,Haliburton Site Haliburton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL LAWRENCE ZETTLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZETTLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2012