Zhang, Irene (CPSO#: 82427)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
515 Dundas Street West, Unit 12
Oakville ON  L6M 4M2
Phone: 905-901-5558
Fax: 905-901-5588
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

15 Martin St, Unit 5
Milton ON  L9T 2R1
Canada
Phone: 905-901-5558
Fax: 905-901-5588
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. I. Zhang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Zhang ( CPSO# 82427 )

Business Address:
12 - 515 Dundas Street West
Oakville ON  L6M 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 901-5558

Business Address:
5 - 15 Martin Street
Milton ON  L9T 2R1
Phone Number: (905) 901-5558

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 22 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IRENE ZHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Dec 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2012