Zhang, Rujin (CPSO#: 92575)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Weifang Medical College, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Mar 2010 to 14 May 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Anaesthesia

The University of Western Ontario, 15 May 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Anaesthesia

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 May 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2012