Zhang, Shulian (CPSO#: 89658)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 24 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Jianxi Medical College, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 29 Jul 2008 to 15 Dec 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 16 Dec 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 24 Aug 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Aug 2009