Zhang, Yong-Li (CPSO#: 95168)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Greenbelt Family Health Team
3500 Fallowfield Rd
Ottawa ON  K2J 4A7
Phone: (613) 843-1718
Fax: (613) 843-0201
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yong-Li Zhang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 14 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Zhang ( CPSO# 95168 )

Business Address:
3500 Fallowfield Road
Ottawa ON  K2J 4A7
Phone Number: (613) 843-1718

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YONG-LI ZHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2013