Zhao, Junyang (CPSO#: 84014)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 12 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Jul 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Beijing Medical University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 27 Feb 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 28 Feb 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jul 2006