Zhao, Meijian (CPSO#: 83251)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:Tianjin Medical University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 200
30 Prospect St.
Newmarket ON  L3Y 3S9
Canada
Phone: 9052357284
Fax: 9052357320
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Meijian Zhao Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Zhao ( CPSO# 83251 )

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
200 - 30 Prospect Street
Pediatric and Teen Health Clinic
Newmarket ON  L3Y 3S9
Phone Number: (905) 235-7284

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEIJIAN ZHAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHAO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 16 Sep 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 17 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016