Zheng, Luke (CPSO#: 101212)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
220 Dundas Street West
Suite 306
Whitby ON  L1N 8M7
Phone: 9056659001
Fax: 9056659335
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Luke Zheng Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 06 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Zheng ( CPSO# 101212)

Business Address:
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
306-220 Dundas Street West
Whitby ON  L1N 8M7

Business Address:
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUKE ZHENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHENG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2017