Zheng, Pei Pei (CPSO#: 90921)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100 Queensway Ave W
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7580 Ext. 2720
Fax: (905) 848-7419
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Zheng Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 15 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Zheng ( CPSO# 90921 )

Business Address:
100 Queensway Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7580

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PEI PEI ZHENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHENG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2012