Zherebitskiy, Viktor (CPSO#: 94776)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 11 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Odessa Medical University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 08 Feb 2011 to 07 Mar 2011
Elective Trainee - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 2014 to 11 Jul 2014
Elective Trainee - Forensic Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jul 2014