Zhou, Jiemin (CPSO#: 95676)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Oct 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Oct 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Shanghai Second Medical College, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie, ON
L4M 4M2
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: 705-728-9090
Fax: 705-728-3039
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

4104 Fairview St
Burlington, ON
Burlington ON  L7L 4Y8
Canada
Phone: 289-962-9333
Fax: 289-274-9839
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JIEMIN ZHOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHOU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2018