Zhu, Tao (CPSO#: 85543)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:SooChow University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
200 Elizabeth Street
Eaton North Room 3 453
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 6934
Electoral District: 10

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2006 to 10 Nov 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 11 Nov 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Aug 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2007