Ziada, Ahmed Mahmoud Ali (CPSO#: 93181)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al-Mustansiriyah, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
120 Wellington St.
St Thomas ON  N5R 2R4
Phone: (519) 633-9200
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ahmed Ziada Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ziada ( CPSO# 93181 )

Business Address:
120 Wellington Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 2R4
Phone Number: (519) 633-9200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jul 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AHMED MAHMOUD ALI ZIADA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZIADA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 09 Jul 2012 to 30 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 31 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 31 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Pharmacology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Pharmacology

The University of Western Ontario, 31 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Pharmacology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 26 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Pharmacology

The University of Western Ontario, 27 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinical Pharmacology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 26 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinical Pharmacology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2014