Ziai, Shawn Anoush (CPSO#: 109662)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
ActiveCare Medical
39 Klondike Road
Kanata, ON
K2K 1X7
Kanata ON  K2K 1X7
Phone: (613) 254-9777
Fax: (613) 254-9778
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Westend FamilyCare Clinic FHT
80 Michael Cowpland Drive
Kanata ON  K2M 1P6
Canada
Phone: 613-599-3321
Fax: 613-599-3366
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

The Ottawa Hospital Academic Family
Health Team
210 Melrose Ave
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4K7
Canada
Phone: 613-761-4334
Fax: 613-761-4200
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2018 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAWN ANOUSH ZIAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZIAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2018