Zieroth, Shelley Rae (CPSO#: 80976)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 30 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 07 Jun 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jun 2009