Zimcik, Heather Lynne (CPSO#: 84730)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lyndhurst Centre
Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
520 Sutherland Drive
Toronto ON  M4G 3V9
Phone: (416) 597-3422 Ext. 6000
Fax: (416) 422-5402
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lakeside LTC
150 Dunn Avenue
Toronto ON  M6K2R7
Canada
Phone: 416-533-2828 Ext. 400
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Heather Zimcik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 25 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Zimcik ( CPSO# 84730 )

Business Address:
Lyndhurst Centre
Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
520 Sutherland Drive
Toronto ON  M4G 3V9
Phone Number: (416) 597-3422

Business Address:
150 Dunn Avenue
Toronto ON  M6K 2R6
Phone Number: (416) 533-2828

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,E.W. Bickle Centre for Complex Continuing Care Toronto
University Health Network,Lyndhurst Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEATHER LYNNE ZIMCIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZIMCIK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2008