Ziradkar, Jyotsna Shailendra (CPSO#: 80744)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Marathi

Education:University of Bombay, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Doctors Medical Walk-in Clinic
Suite 105
641 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6C 2T9
Phone: (519) 686-8585
Fax: (519) 686-8580
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1345 Huron Street
London ON  N5V2E3
Canada
Phone: 5196592331
Fax: 5196594617
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ziradkar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 15 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ziradkar ( CPSO# 80479 )
Dr. J. Ziradkar ( CPSO# 80744 )

Business Address:
Suite 105
641 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6C 2T9
Phone Number: (519) 686-8585

Business Address:
1345 Huron Street
London ON  N5V 2E3
Phone Number: (519) 659-2331

Business Address:
595 Bradley Avenue
London ON  N6E 3Z8
Phone Number: (519) 681-8300

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JYOTSNA SHAILENDRA ZIRADKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZIRADKAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jun 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2008