Zitsow, Jason Howard (CPSO#: 73921)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Nov 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Nov 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
431 King St E
Toronto ON  M5A 1L5
Phone: (416) 368-6304
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church St
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto ON  M3M0B2
Canada
Phone: 416-242-1000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jason Zitsow Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 23 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Zitsow ( CPSO# 73921 )

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-4188

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Business Address:
431 King Street East
Toronto ON  M5A 1L5
Phone Number: (416) 368-6304

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Nov 2001 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 11 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASON HOWARD ZITSOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZITSOW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2001