Zizzo, Andreanne (CPSO#: 90947)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: Benidir, Andreanne (used until: 19 Jul 2016 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Children's Hospital
London Health Sciences Centre
Div of Paediatric Gastroenterology
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8177
Fax: (519) 685-8105
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Zizzo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 26 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Zizzo ( CPSO# 90947 )

Business Address:
London's Children's Hospital
Division of Paediatric Gastroenterology
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8177

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 06 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREANNE ZIZZO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZIZZO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Apr 2015
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2013