Zizzo, Steven Vincent (CPSO#: 94515)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sydney, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 206
325 Winterberry Drive
Hamilton ON  L8J 0B6
Phone: (905) 575-9004
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Steven V. Zizzo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Zizzo ( CPSO# 94515 )

Business Address:
206 - 325 Winterberry Drive
Hamilton ON  L8J 0B6
Phone Number: (905) 575-9004

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Australia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation,St. Peter's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVEN VINCENT ZIZZO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZIZZO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2010 to 21 Jan 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 22 Jan 2011 to 31 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2011 to 31 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2012 to 17 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2013