Zlochower, Dovid Binyomin (CPSO#: 92226)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Oct 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 26 Oct 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Tel Aviv University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 2P8
Phone: (416) 461-9471
Fax: (416) 461-2710
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2010


Corporation Name: Zlochower Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 21 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Zlochower ( CPSO# 92226 )

Business Address:
Albany Medical Clinic
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 2P8
Phone Number: (416) 461-9471

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Oct 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Apr 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 11 Feb 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2011 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Dovid  Binyomin  Zlochower  may  practise medicine independently in family
            medicine, only.