Zolfaghari, Shahram (CPSO#: 83544)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ghazvin University of Medical Sciences, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Gastrointestinal Institute
1910 St Laurent Blvd., Unit 29
Ottawa ON  K1G 1A4
Phone: (613) 686-6656
Fax: (613) 248-9009
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shahram Zolfaghari Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 19 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Zolfaghari ( CPSO# 83544 )

Business Address:
1910 St Laurent Boulevard
Suite 29
Ottawa ON  K1G 1A4
Phone Number: (613) 686-6656

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Business Address:
2675 Concession Road
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone Number: (613) 258-6133

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAHRAM ZOLFAGHARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZOLFAGHARI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 22 Jul 2005 to 27 Sep 2005
Assessment Verification Period - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 28 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008