Zorzi, Alexandra Patricia (CPSO#: 87741)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jan 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
800 Commissioners Road East
Rm B1-112 Victoria Campus
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8494
Fax: (519) 685-8384
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Blayne Welk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 23 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Welk ( CPSO# 91638 )
Dr. A. Zorzi ( CPSO# 87741 )

Business Address:
St Josephs Hospital
Room B4 667
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDRA PATRICIA ZORZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZORZI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Oct 2007 to 29 Oct 2007
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 01 Apr 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Haematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Oct 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2011