Zoudis, Adamantios Panagiotis (CPSO#: 90543)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
272 Lawrence Avenue West
Suite 205
Toronto ON  M5M 4M1
Phone: (416) 787-7516
Fax: (416) 787-7528
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Adamantios Zoudis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 05 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Zoudis ( CPSO# 90543 )

Business Address:
205 - 272 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5M 4M1
Phone Number: (416) 787-7516

Business Address:
55 Civic Road
Scarborough ON  M1L 2K9
Phone Number: (416) 750-3513

Business Address:
305 Balliol Street
Toronto ON  M4S 3H5
Phone Number: (416) 440-0012

Business Address:
2901 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M2K 2Y6
Phone Number: (416) 491-6338

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADAMANTIOS PANAGIOTIS ZOUDIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZOUDIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011