Zoutman, Dick Eric (CPSO#: 52218)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Mar 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Mar 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough Rouge Hospital
Office of the Chief of Staff
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: 416-284-8131 Ext. 4338
Fax: 416-284-7438
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dick Zoutman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Zoutman ( CPSO# 52218 )

Business Address:
Quinte Health Care Corporation
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 08 Sep 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 29 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DICK ERIC ZOUTMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZOUTMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 1991