Zroback, Jesse Peter (CPSO#: 97667)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lake of the Woods District Hospital
21 Sylvan St.
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone: (807) 468-9861
Fax: (807) 468-3939
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zroback Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 18 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Zroback ( CPSO# 97667 )

Business Address:
Lake of the Woods District Hospital
21 Sylvan Street
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone Number: (807) 468-9861

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
Yukon

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Atikokan General Hospital Atikokan
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Geraldton District Hospital Geraldton
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Manitouwadge General Hospital Manitouwadge
McCausland Hospital Terrace Bay
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital Red Lake
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Wilson Memorial General Hospital Marathon

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JESSE PETER ZROBACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZROBACK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2014