Zubkov, Peter (CPSO#: 53494)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Aug 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Sep 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian, Ukrainian

Education:Kharkov Institute of Medicine, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 211
4949 Bathurst Street
North York ON  M2R 1Y1
Phone: 416-221-7117
Fax: 416-221-2669
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER ZUBKOV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZUBKOV is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1983
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2013
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2018

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: June 22, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
In accordance with a voluntary undertaking and consent provided by Dr. Zubkov to the College, the following practice limitations are posted on the public register:

- Dr. Zubkov will engage in direct patient care for a maximum of thirty-six (36) hours per week.

- Dr. Zubkov will see a maximum of twenty (20) patients per day.

- Dr. Zubkov will conduct a maximum of ten (10) housecalls per month.