Zucker, Marc Edward (CPSO#: 71048)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Nov 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Nov 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2664
Fax: (613) 738-4878
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zucker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 17 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Karwowska ( CPSO# 75771 )
Dr. M. Zucker ( CPSO# 71048 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARC EDWARD ZUCKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZUCKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 May 1997 to 30 May 1997
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 May 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 May 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2000