Zufelt, Ryan David (CPSO#: 95785)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Geraldton Medical Group
510 Hogarth Avenue
Geraldton ON  P0T 1M0
Phone: (807) 854-0224
Fax: (807) 854-0227
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ryan Zufelt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Zufelt ( CPSO# 95785 )
Dr. K. TenHoeve ( CPSO# 95986 )

Business Address:
Geraldton Medical Group
510 Hogarth Avenue West
Geraldton ON  P0T 1M0
Phone Number: (807) 854-0224

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Geraldton District Hospital Geraldton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RYAN DAVID ZUFELT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZUFELT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013