Zukotynski, Susan Zofia (CPSO#: 18733)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 308 - 1 Watergarden Way Toronto ON M2K 2Z7
Date Received: 23 May 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Texas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1975 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1963
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018