Zurawska, Joanna Helena (CPSO#: 92699)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
57 Major Mackenzie Drive East
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 1G8
Phone: (905) 780-6873
Fax: (905) 780-6894
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Canada
Phone: 905-883-1212
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Woodbine Medical Centre
Suite 101
7155 Woodbine Ave.
Markham ON  L3R 1A3
Canada
Phone: (416) 628-4020
Fax: (416) 628-4021
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Zurawska and Dr. Kus Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 22 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Zurawska ( CPSO# 92699 )
Dr. L. Kus ( CPSO# 93671 )

Business Address:
57 Major Mackenzie Drive East
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 1G8
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
Woodbine Medical Centre
Suite 101
7155 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 1A3
Phone Number: (416) 628-4020

Business Address:
200 - 2630 Rutherford Road
Vaughan ON  L4K 0H2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 07 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOANNA HELENA ZURAWSKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZURAWSKA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 10 May 2010 to 06 Jun 2010
Elective Trainee - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 07 Jun 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Elective Trainee - Respirology

University of Toronto, 20 Sep 2010 to 17 Oct 2010
Elective Trainee - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 May 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012