Zurawska-Fortin, Urszula (CPSO#: 88380)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: Zurawska, Urszula (used until: 10 Dec 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
6 East Oncology Clinic
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6235
Fax: (416) 530-6656
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fortin and Zurawska-Fortin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. U. Zurawska-Fortin ( CPSO# 88380 )
Dr. C. Fortin ( CPSO# 90497 )

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B9
Phone Number: (416) 530-6235

Business Address:
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9

Business Address:
520 Sutherland Drive
Toronto ON  M4G 3V9
Phone Number: (416) 597-3422

Business Address:
Suite 304
2 Lansing Square
North York ON  M2J 4P8
Phone Number: (416) 489-0711

Business Address:
Bridgepoint Hospital
Room G-178
14 St. Matthews Road
Toronto ON  M4M 2B5
Phone Number: (416) 461-8252

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. URSZULA ZURAWSKA-FORTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZURAWSKA-FORTIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012