Zymantas, Jennifer Ann Carla (CPSO#: 95505)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7147
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sudbury District Nurse Practitioner
623 Main Street
Lively ON  P3Y 1M9
Canada
Phone: (705) 692-1667
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Sudbury District Nurse Practitioner
359 Riverside Drive
Suite 107
Sudbury ON  P3E 1H5
Canada
Phone: (705) 671-1661
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Northern Ontario School of Medicine
935 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 2C6
Canada
Phone: (705) 675-4883
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. A. Zymantas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 21 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Zymantas ( CPSO# 95505 )

Business Address:
935 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 2C6
Phone Number: (705) 675-1151

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Business Address:
107 - 359 Riverside Drive
Sudbury ON  P3E 1H5
Phone Number: (705) 671-1661

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER ANN CARLA ZYMANTAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZYMANTAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2013