da Costa Jr, Leodante Batista (CPSO#: 81405)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Sep 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 17 Sep 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Universidade Federal de Minas Gerais, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room A1 29
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6820
Fax: (416) 480-4988
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: da Costa Jr Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. da Costa Jr ( CPSO# 81405 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room A1 37
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6820

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Brazil

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 17 Sep 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 20 Sep 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 21 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jul 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 23 Jul 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jul 2015 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Leodante Batista da Costa Jr may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery,
                        University  of  Toronto, in which Dr. da Costa Jr holds an academic
                        appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically  expires when Dr. da Costa
                  Jr no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.