de Carvalho, Fabiana Iglesias (CPSO#: 91808)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 16 Oct 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Oct 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universidade de Marilia, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 18 Sep 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 19 Sep 2009 to 16 Oct 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Oct 2009