de Gannes, Gillian Catherine (CPSO#: 75629)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 04 Nov 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Nov 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 28 Aug 2000 to 22 Sep 2000
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 11 Oct 2005 to 04 Nov 2005
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Nov 2005