de Gussem, Els Maria (CPSO#: 87192)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Erasmus University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 13 Aug 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 14 Aug 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2007