de Perrot, Marc Eugene Antoine (CPSO#: 74483)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jan 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 11 Jan 2005

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Geneva, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Thoracic Surgery
UHN - Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street 9N-961
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-5549
Fax: (416) 340-3478
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Aug 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jun 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jun 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Marc Eugene Antoine de Perrot may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  clinical  teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the
                        Department of Surgery,  University  of  Toronto,  in  which  Dr. de
                        Perrot   holds   a  geographical  full-time  teaching  or  research
                        appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  to the extent required  by the teaching or research requirements of
                        his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate will automatically  expire  when  Dr. de Perrot no longer
            holds the appointment, 
                  referred to in clause 1.