de Vrijer, Barbra (CPSO#: 84045)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Feb 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 10 Feb 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English

Education:Erasmus University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital, Room B2-412
800 Commisioners Road E
PO Box 5010
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 646-6106
Fax: (519) 646-6213
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: de Vrijer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. B. de Vrijer ( CPSO# 84045 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital, Room B2 -412
800 Commissioners Road East
P.O. Box 5010
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 646-6106

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Netherlands

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 27 Nov 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 13 Mar 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 09 Feb 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Nov 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Nov 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Nov 2013 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Barbra de Vrijer may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Obstetrics and Gynaecology, University of Western Ontario, in which
                        Dr.  de  Vrijer  holds  an  academic  appointment  at  the  rank of
                        Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. de Vrijer
                  no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.